EP1575255 - A telecommunications system for providing both narrowband and broadband services to subscribers; subscriber equipment; a shelf therefor; a replaceable lowpass filter unit; line termination equipment; network termination equipment; and a telecommunications rack with a plurality of shelves having a redundancy featur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | 16.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czerwiec, Richard Marion 1812 Bonnibee Court Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 02 /
Sutherland, Joseph E. 5405 Thayer Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 03 /
Schepers, Peter Mathijs Leonard Kloosterstraat 53 2880 Bornem / BE | 04 /
Van Wonterghem, Geert Arthur Edith Stationsstraat 18 9900 Eeklo / BE | 05 /
Simmering, Marlin V. Deceased / BE | 06 /
Boeykens, Eduar Christian Maria Victor De Witstraat 49 2880 Bornem / BE | 07 /
Van der Auwera, Christiaan Elise Willem Boomgaardstraat 17 2800 Mechelen / BE | 08 /
Van Rompu, Peter Alain Richard Donkstraat 85A 2870 Puurs / BE | 09 /
Pynaert, Kurt Kerkwegel 12b 9230 Wetteren / BE | 10 /
Verly, Daniel Alo s Cornelius Th. Ellegierslaan 38 9100 Sint Niklaas / BE | 11 /
Van Campenhout, Gilbert Alfons Françoise Lissabonstraat 14 2660 Hoboken / BE | 12 /
Bailey, Richard Haywood 7822 Vauxhill Drive Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 13 /
Peschi, Robert Nicolas Louis 33. Avenue Victor Gilsoul B-1200 Woluwe-Saint-Lambert / BE | 14 /
Van Aken, Dirk Marcel Juliette Johann Sebastian Bachlaan 12 bus 2 1083 Brussel / BE | 15 /
Borowski, Emmanuel Frans Schommenstraat 17a 2250 Olen / BE | 16 /
Reusens, Peter Paul Frans Warande 121 9270 Laarne / BE | 17 /
Verbueken, Herman Leo Rosalia Spechtstraat 23 B-2530 Boechout / BE | 18 /
Ryckebusch, Frank Oudstrijderslei 40 2180 Antwerpen / BE | 19 /
De Wulf, Koen Ambroise Godelieve Breughelstraat 5 1820 Steenokkerzeel / BE | [2005/44] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
Czerwiec, Richard Marion 1812 Bonnibee Court Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | ||
02 /
Sutherland, Joseph E. 5405 Thayer Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | |||
03 /
Schepers, Peter Mathijs Leonard Kloosterstraat 53 2880 Bornem / BE | |||
04 /
Van Wonterghem, Geert Arthur Edith Stationsstraat 18 9900 Eeklo / BE | |||
05 /
Simmering, Marlin V. Deceased / BE | |||
06 /
Boeykens, Eduar Christian Maria Victor De Witstraat 49 2880 Bornem / BE | |||
07 /
Van der Auwera, Christiaan Elise Willem Boomgaardstraat 17 2800 Mechelen / BE | |||
08 /
Van Rompu, Peter Alain Richard Donkstraat 85A 2870 Puurs / BE | |||
09 /
Pynaert, Kurt Kerkwegel 12b 9230 Wetteren / BE | |||
10 /
Verly, Daniel Alo s Cornelius Th. Ellegierslaan 38 9100 Sint Niklaas / BE | |||
11 /
Van Campenhout, Gilbert Alfons Françoise Lissabonstraat 14 2660 Hoboken / BE | |||
12 /
Bailey, Richard Haywood 7822 Vauxhill Drive Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | |||
13 /
Peschi, Robert Nicolas Louis Rue Aime Smekens 71/2 1030 Brussels / BE | |||
14 /
Van Aken, Dirk Marcel Juliette Johann Sebastian Bachlaan 12 bus 2 1083 Brussel / BE | |||
15 /
Borowski, Emmanuel Frans Schommenstraat 17a 2250 Olen / BE | |||
16 /
Reusens, Peter Paul Frans Warande 121 9270 Laarne / BE | |||
17 /
Verbueken, Herman Leo Rosalia Jules Van Beylenstraat 21 2140 Borgerghout / BE | |||
18 /
Ryckebusch, Frank Oudstrijderslei 40 2180 Antwerpen / BE | |||
19 /
De Wulf, Koen Ambroise Godelieve Breughelstraat 5 1820 Steenokkerzeel / BE | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel, et al Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 05076149.3 | 25.05.1998 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | US19970891145 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: US 891145 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575255 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1575255 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/00, H04Q11/04, H04Q1/02, H04M11/06, H04L5/14, H04M3/12 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/16 (EP,US);
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L27/0002 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/023 (EP,US);
H04L5/143 (EP,US);
H04M3/007 (EP,US);
H04M3/12 (EP,US);
H04Q1/028 (EP,US);
H04Q1/03 (EP,US);
H04Q1/10 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0048 (EP,US);
H04L2012/561 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5618 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5625 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5658 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/12 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/802 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13003 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1301 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13199 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1329 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13291 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | H04M11/06, H04L12/28, H04Q11/04, H04Q1/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/37] | Title | German: | Telekommunikationssystem zum Anbieten von sowohl Schmalband- als auch Breitbandienste an Teilnehmer | [2005/37] | English: | A telecommunications system for providing both narrowband and broadband services to subscribers; subscriber equipment; a shelf therefor; a replaceable lowpass filter unit; line termination equipment; network termination equipment; and a telecommunications rack with a plurality of shelves having a redundancy featur | [2005/37] | French: | Système de télécommunication pour fournir aux abonnés des services à bande étroite ainsi que des services à bande large | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Observations by third parties | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 12.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98401239.3 / EP0891067 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980401239) is 11.01.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9524803 (EXCEL IND [US]) [A] 1,2* page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 13 *; | [A] - PARADYNE, "HOTWIRE 8800 digital subscriber line access multiplexer (DSLAM) Installation Guide", INSTALLATION AND OPERATION MANUAL PARADYNE, XX, XX, (19970601), no. 8800-A2-GN21-10, pages 1 - 59, XP003002510 [A] 1,2 * page 1.1 - page 1.5 * | [A] - AMERICAN NATIONAL STANDARDS INSTITUTE INC, "Network and customer installation interfaces - aysmmetric digital subscriber line (ADSL) metallic interface", DRAFT AMERICAN NATIONAL STANDARD FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (19950101), pages I - XII,1, XP003000118 [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [04.1] , [0006] , [0008] * | other | - AMERICAN NATIONAL STANDARDS INSTITUTE INC, "Network and customer installation interfaces - aysmmetric digital subscriber line (ADSL) metallic interface", DRAFT AMERICAN NATIONAL STANDARD FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS, XP003000118 | - ASYMMETRIC DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE FORUM, "ATM over ADSL recommendations", TECHNICAL REPORT TR-002, (199703), XP003000119 | - ASYMMETRIC DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE FORUM, "ADSL forum system reference model", TECHNICAL REPORT TR-001, (199605), pages 1 - 6, XP003000120 | - AT&T PARADYNE, "GlobeLink network access system central office (document no.5100-A2-GB20-P1)", USER'S GUIDE, XP003000121 |