EP1726609 - Hydrophobic coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Benthem, Rudolfus Antonius Theodorus Maria Sportlaan 9 6141 BR Limbricht / NL | 02 /
Ming, Weihua Kasteel Traverse 411 5701 NR Helmond / NL | 03 /
de With, Gijsbertus Valkenierstraat 152 5555 JE Valkenswaard / NL | 04 /
Wu, Di Torenberglaan 5 5628 EL Eindhoven / NL | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Dorrestijn, Antoon DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Dorrestijn, Antoon DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 05076221.0 | 25.05.2005 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726609 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08J3/14, C09D5/03 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B05D5/08 (EP,US);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C09D5/031 (EP,US);
C09D5/1618 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wasserabweisende Beschichtung | [2006/48] | English: | Hydrophobic coating | [2006/48] | French: | couche hydrophobe | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/07] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0950694 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US6068911 | WO0192179 | - DR KARIN ELBL-WEISER, NATURE NEWS SERVICE/ MACMILLAN MAGAZINES, BASF PRESS, (20021028), page 345E | - STÖBER, J. COLL. INTERFACE SCI., (1968), vol. 26, page 62 |