EP1588828 - Method of making topographical support members for producing apertured films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, INC. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, William G. F. 110 Wiltion Avenue Middlesex, NJ 08846 / US | 02 /
James, William A. 551 Scotch Road West Pennington, NJ 08534 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05076548.6 | 14.02.2003 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | US20020356845P | 14.02.2002 Original published format: US 356845 P | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588828 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588828 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/06, B26F1/26, B29C51/22, B26F1/31 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B29C59/06 (EP);
B23K26/0622 (EP);
B23K26/082 (EP);
B23K26/0823 (EP);
B23K26/1494 (EP);
B23K26/382 (EP);
B23K26/40 (EP);
B26F1/26 (EP);
B23K2103/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines topographischen Trägers zur Produktion von perforierten Filmen | [2005/43] | English: | Method of making topographical support members for producing apertured films | [2005/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément de support topographique pour la production de films perforés | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03250924.2 / EP1336466 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | BE | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | IE | 14.02.2010 | LU | 14.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
IE | 14.02.2010 | ||
LU | 14.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
IE | 14.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4377736 (DAUNT JOHN E, et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 57; figure - *; | [X]US4552709 (KOGER II THURMAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 63 - column 9, line 25; figure - *; | [X]US4609518 (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 8, line 11 - line 19; figure - * * column 13, line 5 - line 32 *; | [XY]US4741877 (MULLANE JR WILLIAM I [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figure - * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]WO9523571 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line 30; figure - * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]WO9722434 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 33; claim 14 * * page 21, line 13 - line 34 * * page 26, line 18 - page 27, line 14 * * figures 1-4,17 * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]WO9930658 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]US5916462 (JAMES WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 1, line 59 - column 7, line 43; figure 17 * * column 12, paragraph 1; figure - * [Y] 5-7; | [X]US5945196 (RIEKER GREGORY M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9200050 |