EP1625840 - Coffin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANTERS, Martines Josephus Johanna Caspar Maria Haverkampstraat 9 5408 PD Volkel / NL | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05076791.2 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/07] | Priority number, date | NL20041026811 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: NL 1026811 | [2006/07] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625840 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1625840 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625840 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61G17/00 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
A61G17/004 (EP);
A61G17/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | Sarg | [2006/07] | English: | Coffin | [2006/07] | French: | Cercueil | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/07] | Cercuil | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 31.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IT | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | LV | 09.04.2008 | PL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | LU | 02.08.2008 | IE | 05.08.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.08.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.08.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 05.08.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3411191 (IKERT GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1* column 6, line 7 - line 16 *; | [A]US4044436 (PATRICK JOHN H) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - line 41 * * figure 3 *; | [DA]DE19818558 (TEUBNER HEIKE [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 51 - line 54 * * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * column 2, line 52 - line 54 * |