EP1611892 - Pharmaceutical compositions comprising drospirenone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heil, Wolfgang Am Wassertum 24 21435 Stelle / DE | 02 /
Hilmann, Juergen Ugandastrasse 9 13351 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Lipp, Ralph 11780 Auburn Creek Crossing Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 04 /
Schuermann, Rolf Kantstrasse 83 D-14513 TELTOW / DE | [2006/06] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
Heil, Wolfgang Am Wassertum 24 21435 Stelle / DE | ||
02 /
Hilmann, Juergen Ugandastrasse 9 13351 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Lipp, Ralph 11780 Auburn Creek Crossing Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | |||
04 /
Schuermann, Rolf Schottmüllerstrasse 54 D 14167 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2006/01] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9, P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 05076969.4 | 18.01.2001 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | EP20000200183 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00200183 | US20000484026 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: US 484026 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611892 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1611892 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611892 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/585, A61P33/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP,KR);
A61K31/585 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K31/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | LT | 26.08.2005 | LV | 26.08.2005 | RO | 26.08.2005 | SI | 26.08.2005 | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zubereitung enthaltend Drospirenon | [2006/01] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions comprising drospirenone | [2006/01] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques comprenant du drospirenone | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01900579.2 / EP1257280 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9827929 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * claims 2,11 *; | [E]WO0115701 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A] - MUHN P ET AL, "DROSPIRENONE: A NOVEL PROGESTOGEN WITH ANTIMINERALOCORTICOID AND ANTIANDROGENIC ACTIVITY PHARMACOLOGICAL CHARACTERIZATION IN ANIMAL MODELS", CONTRACEPTION, GERON-X, INC., LOS ALTOS, CA, US, (199502), vol. 51, no. 2, ISSN 0010-7824, pages 99 - 110, XP000908817 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-7824(94)00015-O |