EP1610301 - Speech recognition method based on word duration modelling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Xuedong David 6179 - 155th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
Alleva, Fileno A. 6314 - 204th Drive NE Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 03 /
Jiang, Li 14561 NE 57th Street Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | 04 /
Hwang, Mei-Yuh 20583 NE 31st Street Sammamish, WA 98074 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
Huang, Xuedong D. 20020 NE 121st Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | ||
02 /
Alleva, Fileno A. 16516 NE 48th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
03 /
Jiang, Li 15360 NE 66th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
04 /
Hwang, Mei-Yuh 14802 NE 68th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05077070.0 | 16.09.1998 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | US19970934622 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: US 934622 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610301 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1610301 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610301 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/08 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G10L15/08 (EP,US);
G10L15/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/52] | G10L15/04, G10L15/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2005/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Spracherkennung mittels Modellierung der Wortdauer | [2005/52] | English: | Speech recognition method based on word duration modelling | [2005/52] | French: | Procédé de reconnaissance de la parole basé sur une modélisation de la durée des mots | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98944874.1 / EP1012827 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BURSHTEIN D, "Robust parametric modeling of durations in hidden Markov models", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1995. ICASSP-95., 1995 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DETROIT, MI, USA 9-12 MAY 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950509), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-2431-5, pages 548 - 551, XP010625291 [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003]; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479656 | [A] - ANASTASAKOS A ET AL, "Duration modeling in large vocabulary speech recognition", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1995. ICASSP-95., 1995 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DETROIT, MI, USA 9-12 MAY 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950509), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-2431-5, pages 628 - 631, XP010625311 [A] 1 * paragraph [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479676 | [A] - RABINER L R, "A TUTORIAL ON HIDDEN MARKOV MODELS AND SELECTED APPLICATIONS IN SPEECH RECOGNITION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19890201), vol. 77, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 257 - 285, XP000099251 [A] 1 * paragraph [VI.G] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.18626 |