EP1645304 - Magnetic cycler valve for catheters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flinchbaugh, David E. 4855 Big Oaks Lane Orlando, FL 32806-7826 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states The Hook Research Foundation c/o P.O.S.I., Inc., Sun Towers Mall, Via Ricardo J. Alfaro, Office 39 Panama City / PA | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Bladder Management Systems, LLC. 807 West Morse Boulevard Suite 202 Winter Park FL 32789 / US | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states The Hook Research Foundation Sun Towers Building, 1st Floor, Office 39 Via Ricardo J. Alfero Betamia Panama City / PA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/19] |
Former [2006/15] | 01 /
Flinchbaugh, David E. 4855 Big Oaks Lane Orlando, Florida 32806 / US | Representative(s) | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 2B Clonskeagh Square Clonskeagh Road Dublin 14 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05077381.1 | 01.04.2002 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | US20010280765P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 280765 P | US20010280766P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 280766 P | US20010280769P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 280769 P | US20010284113P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 284113 P | US20010280768P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 280768 P | US20010280767P | 02.04.2001 Original published format: US 280767 P | US20010324601P | 25.09.2001 Original published format: US 324601 P | US20010010534 | 07.12.2001 Original published format: US 10534 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645304 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645304 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1645304 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61F5/44 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61M39/10 (EP,US);
A61F5/4405 (EP,US);
A61M25/0075 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0056 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0078 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Wechselventil für Katheter | [2006/15] | English: | Magnetic cycler valve for catheters | [2006/15] | French: | Vanne magnétique pour cathéter | [2010/33] |
Former [2006/15] | Soupape de changement pour cathéter | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02755398.1 / EP1383557 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Request for further processing for: | 20.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | DE | 01.11.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
DE | 01.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
DE | 01.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
DE | 01.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 30.03.2011 | |
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1220230 (WECK & CO EDWARD [US]) [X] 8 * page 1, column L, line 11 - column R, line 60 * * page 1, column R, line 72 - page 2, column L, line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]US4306705 (SVENSSON JAN A) [A] 1* column 10, line 27 - line 41; figures 1,2,15,20 *; | [Y]US4515593 (NORTON WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 44 - line 54; figure 1 *; | [YDX]US4865588 (FLINCHBAUGH DAVID E [US]) [YD] 6,10-14 * column 3, line 9 - line 53; figure 1 * [X] 8,9; | [Y]DE4220586 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [Y] 7,12 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 42; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4318633 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB2313430 (S G & P PAYNE [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 9, line 2 - line 10 * * page 14, line 6 - page 16, line 21; figures 3,4,6 * [Y] 3,6,7,10,11,14; | [Y]WO0002499 (PHILLIP DAVIS INVENTIONS INC [US]) [Y] 13 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US2602448 | US2860636 | US3598124 | US4230102 | US4335723 | US4424058 | US4865588 | US5114412 | US5183464 | US5735831 | US6096013 | US6673051 | - CECIL, TEXTBOOK OF MEDICINE, SAUNDERS CO., (1988), page 866 | - KUNIN, NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1988), vol. 319, no. 6 |