EP1703535 - Gas discharge panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiokawa, Akira 7-18 Shoji 1-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0002 / JP | 02 /
Murai, Ryuichi 4-67-105 Kamishinden 4-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 554-0002 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Hiroyoshi 288-3 Kuyomozu 1-chome Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0862 / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Yoshiki 222-9 Oaza Okayama Shijounawate-shi Osaka 575-0004 / JP | 05 /
Kudoh, Masatoshi Dai 9 Jinya Haitu 206 2-9-12, Takara Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-0122 / JP | 06 /
Aoki, Masaki 12-1 Aoshinke 5-chome Mino-shi Osaka 562-0024 / JP | 07 /
Higashino, Hidetaka 31-1-1 Hikaridai 7-chome Seikacho, Souraju-gun Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | 08 /
Nonomura, Kinzou 1-5 Mayumi 3-chome Ikoma-shi Nara 630-0122 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05077926.3 | 18.08.1998 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | JP19970222213 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22221397 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703535 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1703535 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/04, H01J17/49, G09G3/28 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/22 (KR);
H01J11/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/30 (EP,US);
H01J11/32 (EP,US);
H01J2211/245 (EP,US);
H01J2211/323 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/38] | Title | German: | Gasentladungstafel | [2006/38] | English: | Gas discharge panel | [2006/38] | French: | Panneau à décharge gazeuse | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 07.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98937849.2 / EP1024516 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980937849) is 02.06.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59146021 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]JPH08306318 (NEC CORP) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]JPH09134675 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * |