EP1598668 - Method for detecting macroscopic inclusions in metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salzgitter Mannesmann GmbH Eisenhüttenstrasse 99 38239 Salzgitter / DE | [2007/31] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Mannesmannröhren-Werke GmbH Wiesenstrasse 36 45473 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinberg, Matthias, Dr. Hoeninghausstrasse 13a 47809 Krefeld / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05090133.9 | 11.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | DE20041025098 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025098 | DE20051022185 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005022185 | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598668 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598668 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/20, G01N21/892 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/2022 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8925 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung makroskopischer Einschlüsse in Metallen | [2005/47] | English: | Method for detecting macroscopic inclusions in metals | [2005/47] | French: | Méthode pour la détection d'inclusions macroscopiques dans des métaux | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | IE | 29.08.2007 | LT | 29.08.2007 | RO | 29.08.2007 | SI | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | IS | 29.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | HU | 01.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/45] | CY | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | LT | 29.08.2007 | |
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 29.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0302003 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-18 *; | [AD]EP0880023 (SIEMAG TRANSPLAN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 50-55 ** column 5, lines 11-28 *; | [A] - Stahllexikon, PETER DRÖSSER GMBH, (20030130), XP002342421 [A] 1-6 * Web-Archiv-Kopie der Internetseite "www.droesser.de/droesser/lexikon/s/stufendrehprobe.html" vom 30.01.2003 (s. URL); page S, paragraph STUFENDREHPROBE * |