EP1615178 - Mobile communication unit, holder for mobile communication unit and event logger system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EAS Surveillance GmbH Ebereschenallee 40 a 14050 Berlin / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellin, Frank Pfalzburger Str. 72 a 10719 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Siedmann, Eric-André Ebereschenallee 40 a 14050 Berlin / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Theobald, Andreas, et al PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 08 03 05 10003 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Theobald, Andreas, et al Rothkopf & Theobald, Patentanwälte, Glinkastrasse 30 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05090194.1 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041033589 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033589 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1615178 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1615178 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
G07C5/0858 (EP);
G07C5/0891 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/26] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobile Kommunikationseinheit, Halterung für eine mobile Kommunikationseinheit und Ereignisdatenschreibersystem für Fahrzeuge | [2006/02] | English: | Mobile communication unit, holder for mobile communication unit and event logger system for vehicles | [2006/02] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile, support pour terminal de communication mobile et système d'enregistrement d'événements pour véhicules | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003219061 ; | [A]DE19728872 (SAVIGNANO MANUEL ALDO [MC]) [A] 4-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0028410 (PHOENIX GROUP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 18 - page 7, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2002063637 (EIDA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO02095757 (BYFORD TREVOR KEITH [GB]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 12, line 19 * * figures 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003219061 A 20030731 (NEC SAITAMA LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4221280 | DE19827622 |