EP1681209 - Side airbag device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takata AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2012/26] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states TAKATA - PETRI AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states TAKATA-PETRI (Ulm) GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3 89081 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heudorfer, Benedikt Bahnstrasse 1 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
Kraft, Michael Traminerweg 58 89075 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Schäfer, Stefan Panoramaweg 24 89155 Erbach / DE | 04 /
Weyrich, Christian Ahornstrasse 9 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 05 /
Rist, Holger Graf-Albrecht-Strasse 50 89160 Dornstadt / DE | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05090363.2 | 29.12.2005 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | DE20051002085 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005002085 | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/29] | DE20051002085 | 14.01.2005 | |
US20050646487P | 25.01.2005 | ||
US20050652731P | 15.02.2005 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1681209 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1681209 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681209 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/231, B60R21/233 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/2338 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R21/233 (EP,US);
B60R2021/161 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23386 (EP,US);
B60R21/237 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/29] | B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/05] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seitenairbageinrichtung | [2006/29] | English: | Side airbag device | [2006/29] | French: | Dispositif de sac gonflable latéral | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0002, 0003 | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.01.2012 | [2012/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0980796 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US6073959 (HEINZ MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]US2002180190 (TOBE JENNIFER M [US], et al) [X] 1,14-16,18-22 * column W *; | [XY]DE10251681 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [X]US2003178831 (ROBERTS BRAD [US], et al) [X] 1,14-16,18-22 * column W *; | [X]DE10331133 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]) [X] 1-3,14-16,18-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1484222 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] * | by applicant | US6695340 |