EP1676989 - Internal combustion engine with a piston cooling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenz, Ingo Suedallee 2 50858 Koeln / DE | 02 /
Weber, Carsten Karl Wichmann Strasse 13 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Morawitz, Urban Volkhovener Weg 199 50765 Köln / DE | 04 /
Laufenberg, Dietmar Hofring 6 51570 Windeck / DE | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05100002.4 | 03.01.2005 | [2006/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676989 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676989 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/08, F01M1/08 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
F01P3/08 (EP,US);
F01M1/08 (EP,US);
F01M2001/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/11] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbrennungsmotor mit einer Kolbenkühlvorrichtung | [2006/27] | English: | Internal combustion engine with a piston cooling device | [2006/27] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne avec un dispositif de refroidissement de piston | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003074346 ; | [AD]US5533472 (SANDS RICHARD H [US], et al) [AD] 1,8-11 * abstract *; | [A]FR2745329 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,8-11* abstract *; | [A]EP0982479 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,10,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030703), vol. 2003, no. 07, & JP2003074346 A 20030312 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * abstract * | by applicant | US4010718 | US5533472 | US6532912 |