EP1557218 - System for purifying the exhaust gases from blast furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL WURTH S.A. 32, rue d'Alsace 1122 Luxembourg / LU | [2006/30] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states SMS DEMAG S.P.A. Via di Francia, 1 16149 Genova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALLASTA, Alessandro Viale Des Geneys 16148, GENOVA / IT | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/29] |
Former [2006/44] | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2005/30] | Porsia, Attilio, Dr., et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 05100188.1 | 13.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | IT2004GE00005 | 23.01.2004 Original published format: IT GE20040005 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557218 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557218 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557218 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/00, B01D50/00, B01D46/24, B04C5/04 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B04C5/28 (EP);
B01D45/16 (EP);
B01D50/40 (EP);
B04C5/04 (EP);
C21B7/002 (EP);
C21B2100/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | B01D50/00, C21B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungssystem für einen Hochofen | [2005/30] | English: | System for purifying the exhaust gases from blast furnaces | [2005/30] | French: | Dispositif de purification des gaz d'échappement d'un haut-fourneau | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | IE | 13.01.2011 | LU | 13.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 28.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL8602941 (ANTONIUS FRANSISCUS MARIA VAN) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-5 * * claims 10,11 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2619498 (BONNET GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 5; claims 5,6 ** figure 2 *; | [X]WO9530119 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 12, line 4 - line 15; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0158568 (FORTUM OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 7, line 11 - line 14 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 4 * * page 13, line 11 - line 18 * * page 22; figure 3 * |