EP1594181 - Fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/45] | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Ju-Yong 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hyoung-Juhn 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Dong-Hun 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
An, Seong-Jin 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 05 /
Cho, Sung-Yong 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 06 /
Eun, Yeong-Chan 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 07 /
Kweon, Ho-Jin 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
KIM, Ju-Yong Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Hyoung-Juhn Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Dong-Hun Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
04 /
AN, Seong-Jin Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
05 /
CHO, Sung-Yong Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
06 /
EUN, Yeong-Chan Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
07 /
KWEON, Ho-Jin Legal&IP Team,Samsung SDI Co.,LTD 428-5, Gongse-Ri Kiheung-Eup, Yongin-City Kyeonggi-Do / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05100558.5 | 28.01.2005 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | KR20040029961 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004029961 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594181 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594181 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/32, H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
C01B3/323 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04082 (EP,US);
H01M8/04225 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04268 (EP);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1223 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1229 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/04156 (EP,US);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | H01M8/06, H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/35] |
Former [2006/28] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellensystem | [2006/25] | English: | Fuel cell system | [2015/19] | French: | Système de pile à combustible | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/45] | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | ||
Former [2005/45] | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | ||
Former [2005/45] | SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.01.2016 | FR | 01.02.2016 | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/47] | GB | 28.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5366820 (TSUTSUMI MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 44 * column 13, lines 7-20 *; | [X]WO0175567 (FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 43,46,47 * claims 1-4 * * page 6, lines 36,37 *; | [X]US2002006535 (WOODS RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * claims 1-33 * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0021] - [0024] - [0034] - [0037] - [0039] , [0045] - [0048] - [0072] *; | [A]WO03071618 (ION AMERICA INC [US], et al) [A] 43-47* the whole document *; | [E]EP1535841 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0019]; figures 1-4; claims 1-21 * | Examination | US6110615 | EP1235291 | by applicant | US5366820 | WO9605625 | US6110615 | WO0175567 | US2002006535 | EP1235291 | WO03071618 | EP1535841 |