EP1566758 - Implementing data quality using rule bases and knowledge engineering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamraparni, Dasu 108 Possum Way New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 02 /
Vesonder, Gregory, T. 15 Southview Drive Boonton Township, NJ 07005 / US | 03 /
Wright, Jon, R. 55 Sedgefield Drive Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05101089.0 | 14.02.2005 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | US20040782183 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: US 782183 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566758 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/20] |
Former [2005/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auf Regeln und Wissenentwicklung basierende Datenqualitätsimplementierung. | [2005/34] | English: | Implementing data quality using rule bases and knowledge engineering | [2005/34] | French: | La mise en oeuvre de la qualité de données a base de règles et génie cognitif. | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0807892 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US2003140307 (BAR-YOSSEF ZIV [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * Abstract * * figures 1-11 * * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2003212629 (KING PHILIP JOSEPH BENTON [US]) [A] 1,7,11,17 * Abstract ** claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2003217111 (MCKAY JOHN T [US]) [A] 1,7-11,17-20 * Abstract * * claims 1-10 * |