EP1577761 - Method and apparatus for developing of operating software for an operator device of an automation component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/38] | Method and apparatus for developing operating softeware for an operator device of an automation component | ||
[2005/43] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denzlein, Michael Westerwaldweg 2 91056, Erlangen / DE | [2005/38] | Application number, filing date | 05101131.0 | 15.02.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | DE20041010203 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010203 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1577761 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1577761 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G06F8/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung einer Projektierung für ein Bediengerät einer Automatisierungskomponente | [2005/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for developing of operating software for an operator device of an automation component | [2005/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour créer un logiciel de contrôle pour un appareil de contrôle de composant d'automatisation | [2005/43] |
Former [2005/38] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung einer Bediensoftware für ein Bediengerät einer Automatisierungskomponente | ||
Former [2005/38] | Method and apparatus for developing operating softeware for an operator device of an automation component | ||
Former [2005/38] | Procédé et dispositif pour créer des logiciels de contrôle pour un appareil de contrôle de composant d'automatisation | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 23.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08223524 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2003058238 (DOAK DAVID GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0174] *; | [A]US2003151538 (ESCOBOSA MARCUS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] , [0053] * * figure 5 *; | [DX] - SIEMENS AG, "SIMATIC HMI, ProTool V6.0, Service Pack 2, Windows-basierte Systeme projektieren", (200212), URL: http://www.energietechnik.fh-dortmund.de/personen/walter/walter/mikrocontroller_infos/ProTool/ProTool_WIN_BHB_d.pdf, (20070816), XP002447179 [DX] 1-9 * page 1.1 * * page 1.2 * * page 4.37 * * page 4.38 * | by applicant | WO02101596 |