EP1571768 - Mixer apparatus and sound signal processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Atsuo, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Terada, Kotaro, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Ettmayr, Andreas, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05101302.7 | 21.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040052135 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004052135 | JP20040052136 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004052136 | JP20040052137 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004052137 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571768 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571768 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04H7/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H04H60/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Mischgerät und Tonsignalverarbeitungsverfahren | [2005/36] | English: | Mixer apparatus and sound signal processing method | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif de mélange et procédé de traitement du signal sonore | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 18.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 07.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9937032 (MACKIE DESIGNS INC [US]) [I] 1-28 * figures 1-5 * * page 8, lines 4-23 * * page 15, lines 5-22 *; | [I]EP1058414 (TEAC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-28 * figures 1,5 ** paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0024] , [0026] , [0040] *; | [I]US2003055518 (AISO MASARU [JP], et al) [I] 1-38 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0064] * |