EP1579930 - Bending device for bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMES OFFICINE MECCANICHE Srl Via del Municipio, 25 33010 REANA DEL ROJALE (UD) / IT | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silvestri, Aldo Via del Municipio, 33 33010, REANA DEL ROJALE (UD) / IT | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 05101389.4 | 24.02.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | IT2004UD00032 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: IT UD20040032 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579930 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579930 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D11/12 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B21D11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Biegen von Stangen | [2005/39] | English: | Bending device for bars | [2005/39] | French: | Machine à cintrer des barres | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 03.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2007 | BE | 26.09.2007 | CH | 26.09.2007 | CY | 26.09.2007 | CZ | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | LI | 26.09.2007 | LT | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | PL | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SI | 26.09.2007 | SK | 26.09.2007 | TR | 26.09.2007 | BG | 26.12.2007 | SE | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | IS | 26.01.2008 | LU | 24.02.2008 | IE | 25.02.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
LU | 24.02.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 26.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3857271 (RITTER J, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2723846 (HUFNAGL & CO RISTA DRAHT); | [A]US4456036 (ROSSI PIERGIORGIO [CH]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0379043 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0379030 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0437714 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]); | [A]EP0538595 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0900602 (OSCAM SPA [IT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9926739 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |