EP1575246 - Method and apparatus for limiting reuse of domain name system response information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Douglis, Frederick 152 Smoke Rise Road Basking Ridge, NJ New jersey 07920 / US | 02 /
Rabinovich, Michael 55 Cottage Place Gillette, NJ New Jersey 07933 / US | 03 /
Spatscheck, Oliver 15 Lawrence Road Randolph, NJ New Jersey 07869 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05101500.6 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | US20040798076 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: US 798076 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575246 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575246 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/58 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/10015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/22] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Beschränkung der Wiederbenutzung von DNS Antworten | [2005/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for limiting reuse of domain name system response information | [2005/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour limiter le réemploi de réponses à des requêtes DNS | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6205477 (JOHNSON RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 30 - line 60 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 33 *; | [A]US6351743 (DEARDO CARMEN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - line 38 * * column 2, line 15 - line 43 * * column 3, line 29 - line 42 *; | [A] - MICHELE COLAJANNI AND PHILIP S. YU, "A performance study of robust load sharing strategies for distributed heterogeneous Web server systems", IEEE TRANS KNOWL DATA ENG; IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING MARCH/APRIL 2002, (200203), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 398 - 414, XP002333859 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [05.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/69.991724 | [A] - COHEN E ET AL, "Proactive caching of DNS records: addressing a performance bottleneck", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030422), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 707 - 726, XP004414295 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(02)00424-3 |