EP1583373 - Provision of network resources controlled services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kain, Albert Winterburgerstrasse 11/22/4 A-1160 Wien / AT | 02 /
Miyagawa, Sumio Handelskai 204/27 A-1020 Wien / AT | [2005/40] | Application number, filing date | 05101574.1 | 01.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | DE20041015267 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004015267 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583373 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1583373 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04L12/28 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04L47/781 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/801 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L47/825 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2008/48] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzressourcengesteuerte Dienst-Bereitstellung | [2005/40] | English: | Provision of network resources controlled services | [2005/40] | French: | Prestation de services sous contrôle des ressources de réseau | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001023181 (SAVOLAINEN JARMO JUHANI [FI]) [Y] 5,10,11,13,20* the whole document *; | [XDY] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Dynamic Policy control enhancements for end-to-end QoS; (Release 6)", 3GPP TR 23.917 V1.2.0 (2004-01) TECHNICAL REPORT, (20040101), pages 1 - 35, XP002467657 [XD] 1-4,6-9,12,14-19,21 * page 5, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 5 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 24 * * page 12, line 9 - line 11 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 9 * * page 21, line 3 - line 20 * [Y] 5,10,11,13,20 |