EP1571060 - Vehicle with a pneumatic control line for operating the brakes of a trailer. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gooding, Nigel 75 Powers Hall End Witham Essex CM8 1NH / GB | 02 /
Chapman, Martin 36 Plymtree Road Southend on Sea, Essex / GB | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Gooding, Nigel 75 Powers Hall End CM8 1NH, Witham / GB | ||
02 /
Chapman, Martin 36 Plymtree Road Southend on Sea / GB | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | CNH IP Department c/o CNH Belgium NV, Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 05101748.1 | 07.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | GB20040005087 | 06.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0405087 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571060 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571060 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/26 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
B60T13/263 (EP);
B60T13/683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit einer pneumatischen Steuerleitung für Anhängerbremsen | [2005/36] | English: | Vehicle with a pneumatic control line for operating the brakes of a trailer. | [2005/36] | French: | Véhicule avec un conduit pneumatique pour les frains de remorque | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | LT | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | PL | 04.10.2006 | RO | 04.10.2006 | SI | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | IS | 04.02.2007 | IE | 07.03.2007 | LU | 07.03.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | HU | 05.04.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
PL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IS | 04.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE679682 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3431674 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4616881 (MUELLER EGBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 3; figure 2 *; | [A]US4671578 (ROTHEN JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-4* figure 1 * |