EP1600840 - Pressure reducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANS SASSERATH & CO KG Mühlenstrasse 62 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2005/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecking, Willi Askanierstrasse 38 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Renate, et al Bleibtreustraße 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Weisse, Renate, et al Weisse & Wolgast Bökenbuschstr. 41 42555 Velbert / DE | Application number, filing date | 05101771.3 | 08.03.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | DE20041025814 | 24.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025814 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1600840 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1600840 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/06 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G05D16/0672 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckminderer | [2005/48] | English: | Pressure reducer | [2005/48] | French: | Détendeur | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2767725 (LONG HENRY A) [A] 1-5* column 3, line 35 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0076767 (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 2-5; | [X]SU1381449 (MO I KHIM MASH [SU]) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0650108 | EP0650109 | EP0972995 |