EP1634833 - Printing machine comprising at least one printing group. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Günther Riedstr. 18 97225, Zellingen / DE | [2006/11] | Application number, filing date | 05101871.1 | 19.12.2003 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | DE2003104295 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10304295 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634833 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1634833 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634833 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/32, B65H39/16, B65H45/22 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B65H23/32 (EP,US);
B41F13/56 (EP,US);
B65H39/16 (EP,US);
B65H45/225 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | Druckmaschine mit mindestens einem Druckwerk | [2006/11] | English: | Printing machine comprising at least one printing group. | [2006/11] | French: | Machine à imprimer comprenant au moins un groupe d'impression. | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 13.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03785589.7 / EP1590283 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2007
21.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2007
21.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Alois-Sennefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2007
21.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE manroland AG Intellectual Property (IP) 86219 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2007
21.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 00 96 86135 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2007
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | 26.09.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/51] | 09.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.11.2006 | CZ | 15.11.2006 | EE | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | IE | 15.11.2006 | IT | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | RO | 15.11.2006 | SI | 15.11.2006 | SK | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | AT | 19.12.2006 | LU | 19.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 15.02.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | HU | 16.05.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
TR | 15.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
LU | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
HU | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
HU | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CZ | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB352003 (ROBERT RUTHERFORD MCCORMICK) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE19728207 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10131976 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,3 * the whole document * |