EP1705372 - Variable pump or hydraulic motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNAS B.V. Nikkelstraat 15 4823 AE Breda / NL | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achten, Peter Fazantlaan 3a 3613 CA, Eindhoven / NL | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf, et al Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf, et al Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A, P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | Application number, filing date | 05101934.7 | 11.03.2005 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705372 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/20, F01B3/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
F04B1/2007 (EP,US);
F04B1/2014 (EP,US);
F04B1/2071 (EP,US);
F04B1/2085 (EP,US);
F04B1/24 (EP,US);
F04B1/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einstellbare Pumpe oder Hydraulikmotor | [2006/39] | English: | Variable pump or hydraulic motor | [2006/39] | French: | Pompe variable ou moteur hydraulique | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5253576 (BETHKE DONALD G [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 26 *; | [A]EP1302661 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO03058035 (INNAS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 26; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2005019171 (ACHTEN PETER A J [NL]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | WO03058035 |