EP1703731 - Method to encrypt content with conditional access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRANSKY, Philippe Chemin des Grands-Champs 1033, Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile, et al Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile, et al Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clémenty 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 05102027.9 | 15.03.2005 | [2006/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703731 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/167 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H04N21/4181 (EP);
H04N21/4367 (EP);
H04N21/4623 (EP);
H04N7/163 (EP);
H04N7/1675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/21] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verschlüsselung von Daten mit bedingtem Zugriff | [2006/38] | English: | Method to encrypt content with conditional access | [2006/38] | French: | Méthode d'encryption d'un contenu à accès conditionnel | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/49] | 03.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2732537 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0858184 (NDS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 7 * * column 9, line 43 - column 11, line 19 * * claims 1-4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002194613 (UNGER ROBERT ALLAN [US]) [A] 1-5 * figures 3,7,8 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0031] , [0032] , [0039] , [0040] * * claims 1,4,6,8,17 *; | [Y]US2004075773 (KIMURA JUNICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 2-5,9 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0030] - [0040] - [0043] * * claims 1,3-8 * * abstract *; | [A] - GUILLOU L C ET AL, "ENCIPHERMENT AND CONDITIONAL ACCESS", SMPTE JOURNAL, SMPTE INC. SCARSDALE, N.Y, US, (19940601), vol. 103, no. 6, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 398 - 406, XP000457575 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * * voire en particulier: figures 1-5 * |