EP1583322 - A method and system for recovering password protected private data via a communication network without exposing the private data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Back, Adam c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Dharmarajan, Baskaran c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
Toncheva, Dafina Ivanova c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
Chan, Kok Wai c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
Newaskar, Rahul Shrikant c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05102586.4 | 01.04.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040816756 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 816756 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583322 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/22 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
B23B47/00 (KR);
B23Q11/0046 (KR);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
B23B2270/30 (KR);
H05K3/0047 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von passwortgeschützten Privatdaten über ein Kommunikationsnetzwerk ohne die Privatdaten bloss zu stellen | [2005/40] | English: | A method and system for recovering password protected private data via a communication network without exposing the private data | [2005/40] | French: | Méthode et système pour récupérer des données privées protégées par un mot de passe par un réseau de communication, sans exposer les données privées | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |