EP1710948 - Securing a Communicaton Link Between Devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Michael K 8 Fernwood Place N2M 2Z2, Kitchener / CA | 02 /
Little, Herb 504 Old Oak Place N2T 2V8, Waterloo / CA | 03 /
Brown, Michael S 350 University Downs Crescent N2K 4B1, Waterloo / CA | 04 /
Adams, Neil 550 Little Dover Cres. N2K 4E4, Waterloo / CA | 05 /
McCallum, Michael 23 Janet Court N2A 4B8, Kitchener / CA | 06 /
Davis, Dinah 9 Dietz Avenue North N2L 2J3, Waterloo / CA | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/41] | Rickard, David John, et al ipulse 9-10 Savile Row London W1S 3PF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05102639.1 | 04.04.2005 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710948 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710948 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G06Q20/327 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP);
G07F7/0886 (EP);
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G07F7/1016 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | 28.04.2005 | BA | 28.04.2005 | HR | 28.04.2005 | LV | 28.04.2005 | MK | 28.04.2005 | YU | 28.04.2005 | Title | German: | Sicherung einer Kommunikationsverbindung zwischen Geräten. | [2007/10] | English: | Securing a Communicaton Link Between Devices | [2006/41] | French: | Sécurisation d'une liaison de communication entre des dispositifs. | [2006/41] |
Former [2006/41] | Sicherung einer Kommunikationsverbindung zwischen Geräte. | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 20.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2007 | BE | 14.03.2007 | CH | 14.03.2007 | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | IT | 14.03.2007 | LI | 14.03.2007 | LT | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | PL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | LU | 04.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | IS | 14.07.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CH | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0002358 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 9 ** figure 4 *; | [YA]US2002076054 (FUKUTOMI SHOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7,9,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 2-6,8,10-12; | [A]US2003041244 (BUTTYAN LEVENTE [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0200] *; | [YA]US2004184606 (ROSE GREGORY G [AU]) [Y] 1,7,9,13,14 * abstract * [A] 2-6,8,10-12 |