EP1712162 - Traditional teapot having rotatable holding means to avoid burns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Güzelis Porselen Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Uzuncarsi Havanci Sokak No : 15/1 Mercan, Istanbul 34450 / TR | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdogan, Erol Güzelis Porselen Sanayi ve Tic. A.S. Uzuncarsi Havanci Sokak No: 15/1 Mercan 34450, Istanbul / TR | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Calik, Güven PusulaPatent Intellectual Property Service Ltd. Büyükdere cad. No: 35/15 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Calik, Güven PusulaPatent Intellectual Property Service Ltd. Büyükdere cad. No: 35/15 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | ||
Former [2006/42] | Calik, Güven PusulaPatent Intellectual Property Service Ltd. Büyükdere cad. No: 26/12 Mecidiyeköy TR-34387 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 05103032.8 | 15.04.2005 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712162 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/14, A47J45/06 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
A47J45/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Herkömmliche Teekanne mit Halterung zur Vermeidung von Verbrennungen | [2006/42] | English: | Traditional teapot having rotatable holding means to avoid burns | [2006/42] | French: | Théière classique presentant des des moyens de retenue pour éviter des brulures | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB650969 (STEELE & DOLPHIN LTD, et al) [Y] 1,6 * pages 4-7; figure - *; | [Y]DE2508263 (NORRA WOLF DIETER) [Y] 1,6 * pages 5-7 * * page 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4901630 (HALL MITCHELL B [US]) [A] 1* column 3, lines 36-48; figures 1,9,10 * |