EP1612642 - Systems and methods for licensing operating systems using an emulated computing environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neil, Mike c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05104387.5 | 24.05.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20040882827 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: US 882827 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612642 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612642 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/126 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Lizenzierung von Betriebssystemen mittels einer Emulierten Computer-Betriebsumgebung | [2006/01] | English: | Systems and methods for licensing operating systems using an emulated computing environment | [2006/01] | French: | Système et procédé de gestion de licences de systèmes d'exploitation à l'aide d'un environnement d'ordinateur émulé | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5260999 (WYMAN ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 30 * * column 15, line 42 - line 64 * * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 11 * * column 23, line 3 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]JP2000357086 (IBM) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | US6959291 [ ] (ARMSTRONG WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [ ] * column 2, line 25 - line 35 * |