EP1612307 - Fibre disintegrating device for spinning machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2008/21] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt Spinnereimaschinenbau AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuller, Edmund Weckenweg 13 85055, Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
Schermer, Josef Egweiler Strasse 21 86673, Bergheim-Unterstall / DE | 03 /
Burchert, Mathias Edith-Stein-Strasse 67 73760, Ostfildern / DE | 04 /
Funk, Wilhelm Brückenstrasse 5c 8280, Kreuzlingen / CH | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05104647.2 | 31.05.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | DE20041029659 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004029659 | DE20041051676 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051676 | DE20041053427 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053427 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612307 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612307 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612307 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/32 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
D01H4/32 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C28/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Auflöseeinrichtung für Spinnmaschinen | [2006/01] | English: | Fibre disintegrating device for spinning machines | [2006/01] | French: | Dispositif défibreur pour métiers à filer | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IE | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | AT | 31.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | LU | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GB | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
AT | 31.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
LU | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
AT | 31.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4358922 (FELDSTEIN NATHAN) [X] 1,6,11,13,26-28 * column 2, line 30 - line 56 * * column 3, line 17 - line 27; claims 1-4,8,11-14,17,18,27-32 * [A] 8; | [XY]DE4101680 (HEINZEL WINFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,11,13,28,30-34 * column 2, line 13 - line 56 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 66 * [Y] 2,7,12,17,22,29,36,41; | [X]EP0599286 (ZEHLENDORF SPINNSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,11,26-28,30-32 * page 2, line 6 - line 19 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 55; claim - *; | [X]EP0631961 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,11,26-28,30-32 * page 2, line 6 - line 19 * * page 5, line 18 - line 45; claims 3,4 *; | [A]EP0861930 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6,8-11,13,14,28-35,37,38 * column 9, line 20 - line 29; claims 1,8,18-20,25-30 *; | [X]DE19822265 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [X] 27 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0052225 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]); | [A]EP1096043 (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,8,9,25,28,29 * claim - *; | [AX]US6293083 (SCHNEIDER HARALD [DE]) [A] 1,7,8,11,12,17,19,20,22,23,28,36,41,43 * column 2, line 40 - line 55; figure -; claim - * [X] 27; | [AY]EP1233088 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [A] 1,3-6,8,10,11,13,14,17,25,28,30-33,35,37,38,41 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0016] , [0033] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038]; claims 5,11,15,16,24,25,31,32 * [Y] 2,29; | [Y]DE10109523 (CERAM TEC AG INNOVATIVE CERAMI [DE]) [Y] 7,12,17,22,36,41 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009]; claim - * |