EP1729082 - Automatic gas powered gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FX Airguns AB Fagerlid 548 92 HOVA / SE | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Axelsson, Fredrik Granitvägen 10 542 31 Mariestad / SE | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Edlund, Fabian, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Edlund, Fabian, et al AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05104862.7 | 03.06.2005 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1729082 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729082 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F41B11/06, F41B11/32 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
F41B11/723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Title | German: | Automatische Gaswaffe | [2006/49] | English: | Automatic gas powered gun | [2006/49] | French: | Arme à gaz comprimé | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 16.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | BE | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | LT | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | PL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | IS | 17.01.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | IE | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | LU | 03.06.2009 | ES | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 03.06.2009 | ||
ES | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 03.06.2009 | ||
ES | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
ES | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
ES | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5063905 (FARRELL KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1416244 (WESTERN ARMS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0024]; figures 1,4-7; claims 1-5 * |