EP1605111 - Modular system and joint for the construction of extensive frameworks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capperucci, Donatella Via Ungheria, 1 53036 Poggibonsi - Siena / IT | For all designated states Consani, Franco Via Ungheria, 1 53036 Poggibonsi (Siena) / IT | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Consani, Franco Via Ungheria, 1 53036 Poggibonsi (SI) / IT | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 05104955.9 | 07.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | IT2004FI00130 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: IT FI20040130 | IT2004FI00131 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: IT FI20040131 | [2005/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605111 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605111 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/19 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
E04B1/1909 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Modulares System und Verbindung für die Konstruktion von Rahmenwerken | [2005/50] | English: | Modular system and joint for the construction of extensive frameworks | [2005/50] | French: | Système modulaire et connexion pour la construction des structures | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 14.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | LT | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | PL | 18.07.2007 | RO | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | DE | 19.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | IS | 18.11.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | HU | 19.01.2008 | FR | 14.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/45] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
DE | 19.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
DE | 19.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
DE | 19.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
DE | 19.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
LT | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IS | 18.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 18.07.2007 | |
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 18.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB832306 (FENTIMAN & SONS LTD F) [A] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US3688461 (RENSCH EBERHARD G) [A] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4671693 (ROSSMAN WENDELL E [US]) [A] 1,17* the whole document * |