EP1604858 - Fuel tank and the relative method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, DK, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVECO S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicosia, Biagio Via Sagra di San Michele, 45 10141 Torino / IT | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05105119.1 | 10.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI01172 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: IT MI20041172 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604858 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604858 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/03, B29C41/20 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B29C45/0053 (EP);
B29C41/04 (EP);
B29C41/20 (EP);
B60K15/03177 (EP);
B29L2031/7172 (EP);
B60K2015/03453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] |
Former [2006/34] | |||
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstofftank und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2005/50] | English: | Fuel tank and the relative method of production | [2005/50] | French: | Réservoir de carburant et méthode de sa production | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 29.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2007 | BE | 16.05.2007 | CH | 16.05.2007 | CY | 16.05.2007 | CZ | 16.05.2007 | EE | 16.05.2007 | FI | 16.05.2007 | LI | 16.05.2007 | LT | 16.05.2007 | NL | 16.05.2007 | PL | 16.05.2007 | RO | 16.05.2007 | SI | 16.05.2007 | SK | 16.05.2007 | TR | 16.05.2007 | LU | 10.06.2007 | IE | 11.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | BG | 16.08.2007 | DK | 16.08.2007 | GR | 17.08.2007 | IS | 16.09.2007 | PT | 16.10.2007 | HU | 17.11.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/11] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LT | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
PL | 16.05.2007 | ||
IS | 16.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4357293 (WILLIAMSON JR JAMES H) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 51 - line 55 * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]US4504535 (SNYDER LARRY L [US]) [A] 1,7* column 2, line 17 - line 27; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2003047835 (AMBURGEY NANCY [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0033] , [0036] , [0037] * |