EP1734494 - Adverstisement pendant, specially for wine bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL GRAPHICS ARTS LIMITED 41 Chalton Street London N1W 1JD / GB | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [2006/51] | Application number, filing date | 05105139.9 | 13.06.2005 | [2006/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734494 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, G09F3/02, G09F23/06 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G09F23/06 (EP);
G09F3/02 (EP);
G09F3/0341 (EP);
G09F3/10 (EP);
G09F2003/0273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werbeanhänger, insbesondere für Weinflaschen | [2006/51] | English: | Adverstisement pendant, specially for wine bottles | [2006/51] | French: | Pendentif publicitaire, notamment pour bouteilles de vin | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003043919 ; | [X]JP2003002312 ; | [A]GB483061 (RUDOLF BARENDS) [A] 1-10 * page 1, column R, line 61 - line 90 * * page 2, column L, line 18 - line 21 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]US3149431 (BLISH MATHEW B) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 7 - line 57 ** figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE19716262 (ZODROW RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2366279 (MARKS SPENCER PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 15 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030603), vol. 2003, no. 06, & JP2003043919 A 20030214 (OZAKI SEITAISHO:KK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003002312 A 20030108 (SEALEX CORP; IES:KK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * |