EP1736312 - Heat-sensitive imaging element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callant, Paul AGFA-GEVAERT, Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Andriessen, Hieronymus AGFA-GEVAERT, Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Williamson, Alexander AGFA-GEVAERT, Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Geukens, Christel AGFA-GEVAERT, Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 05 /
Louwet, Jos AGFA-GEVAERT, Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 05105440.1 | 21.06.2005 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736312 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736312 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
C09B59/00 (KR);
B41C1/10 (EP,US);
B41C1/1025 (EP,US);
B41C1/1041 (EP,US);
B41M5/465 (EP,US);
C09B23/0066 (EP,US);
C09B23/0091 (EP,US);
C09B23/083 (EP,US);
C09B23/086 (EP,US);
C09B23/10 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Bildaufzeichnungselement | [2006/52] | English: | Heat-sensitive imaging element | [2006/52] | French: | Elément thermosensible pour l'enregistrement d'images | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | LU | 21.06.2008 | IE | 23.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 04.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
LU | 21.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
LU | 21.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1300241 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]EP1428676 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0108] *; | [A]EP1508440 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0058] * |