EP1624540 - Method for a power controlled electric motor supplied by a DC power system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haderer, Guenter Im Gruen 34 A 77815 Buehl / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Christoph 52, Rue de la Gare 67480 Auenheim / FR | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 05105532.5 | 22.06.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | DE20041037918 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004037918 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1624540 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1624540 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/14, H02P7/29 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H02P7/29 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | H01R43/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2014/51] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum leistungsgesteuerten Betreiben eines Elektromotors an einem Gleichspannungsnetz | [2006/06] | English: | Method for a power controlled electric motor supplied by a DC power system | [2006/06] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler en puissance un moteur électrique sur un réseau à tension continue | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 08.11.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH044790 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1* abstract *; | [XA]DE10051573 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * * column 2 - column 6 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3-6,8; | [Y]JP2003237605 (NSK LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0571755 |