EP1612668 - Method and system for transforming a computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 45 Rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Emmanuel THALES Int. Property 31-33, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil / FR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05105748.7 | 28.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | FR20040007381 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407381 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612668 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/45 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G06F8/427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Transformation eines Computerprogramms | [2006/01] | English: | Method and system for transforming a computer program | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé de transformation de code informatique et produit/programme d'ordinateur pour la mise en oeuvre d'un tel procédé | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 29.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0539120 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 5-8 * column 2, line 12 - line 28 * * column 4, line 20 - line 28 * * column 6, line 46 - line 54 * * column 7, line 17 - line 31 * * column 9, line 37 - line 43 *; | [XY]US2003106049 (UNGAR DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * [Y] 5-8; | [X] - MASIERO P C ET AL, "Legacy systems reengineering using software patterns", COMPUTER SCIENCE SOCIETY, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. SCCC '99. XIX INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE CHILEAN TALCA, CHILE 11-13 NOV. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991111), ISBN 0-7695-0296-2, pages 160 - 169, XP010365295 [X] 1 * figure 1 * * page 162, partie 3.2. "The recognition of Patterns in object models" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SCCC.1999.810173 | [A] - CHIN D N ET AL, "DECODE: A CO-OPERATIVE PROGRAM UNDERSTANDING ENVIRONMENT", JOURNAL OF SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE : RESEARCH AND PRACTICE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, GB, (199601), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1040-550X, pages 3 - 33, XP000570563 [A] 5-7 * page 5; figure 1 * * page 9, partie "Background: the Concept Recognizer" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-908X(199601)8:1<3::AID-SMR122>3.0.CO;2-I |