EP1612617 - Polyaniline filled polyimide weldable intermediate transfer belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/01] | Polyaniline filled polyimide weldable intermediate transfer components | ||
[2009/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodman, Donald J. 6 Warder Drive 14534, Pittsford / US | 02 /
Griffin, Scott J. 2401 Salt Road 14450, Fairport / US | 03 /
Santana, Felix J. 1012 Hard Rock Road 14580, Webster / US | 04 /
Flanagan, Robert J. 76 Princeton Lane 14450, Fairport / US | 05 /
Simone, Joellen 7264 Knickerbocker Road 14519, Ontario / US | 06 /
Yu, Robert C U 1169 Hidden Valley Trail 14580, Webster / US | 07 /
Kerwawycz, John P. 29 Mertensia Lane 14467, Henrietta / US | 08 /
Satchidanand, Mishra 459 Sherborne Road 14580, Webster / US | 09 /
Parikh, Satish R. 80 Treebrook Drive 14625, Rochester / US | 10 /
Grabowski, Edward F. 479 Sherborne Road 14580, Webster / US | 11 /
Torpey, Matthew J. 24 Devonwood Lane 14534, Pittsford / US | 12 /
Hinckel, John M. 154 Grantham Road 14609, Rochester / US | 13 /
Roetker, Michael S. 612 Shady Glen Circle 14580-8958, Webster / US | 14 /
Silvestri, Markus R. 29 Clarkes Crossing 14450, Fairport / US | 15 /
Darcy III, John J. 347 Brooksboro Drive 14580, Webster / US | 16 /
Martin, David W. 1471 Hidden Pond Lane 14568, Walworth / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05105887.3 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20040884773 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: US 884773 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612617 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612617 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612617 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G03G15/162 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/15] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verschweissbares, polyanilingefülltes Polyimid Zwischenübertragungsband | [2009/36] | English: | Polyaniline filled polyimide weldable intermediate transfer belt | [2009/36] | French: | Bande de transfert intermédiaire soudable contenant des polyimides remplis de polyaniline | [2009/36] |
Former [2006/01] | Polyanilin gefüllte Polyimid verschweissbare Zwischenübertragungskomponenten | ||
Former [2006/01] | Polyaniline filled polyimide weldable intermediate transfer components | ||
Former [2006/01] | Composants de transfert intermédiaire contenant des polyimides soudables remplis de polyaniline | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 31.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1014217 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] * [Y] 6-9; | [Y]EP1205821 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 6-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0051] * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP1255169 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] ** example 1 * |