EP1617435 - Audio playback device and method for reproducing an audio file [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd 416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Ji-woon 135-1303, Parktown Lotte Apartment, Sunae-dong Bundang-gu Seognam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05106158.8 | 06.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | KR20040052900 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004052900 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617435 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1617435 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/16 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2006/46] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tonwiedergabegerät und Verfahren für die Wiedergabe einer Tondatei | [2006/03] | English: | Audio playback device and method for reproducing an audio file | [2006/03] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction sonore ainsi que méthode pour la reproduction d'un fichier audiophonique | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 09.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03023786 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 20 - line 23 * * page 12, line 3 - line 15 *; | [PX]EP1511039 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0044] - [0049]; figures 3,4,7 *; | [X] - FOOBAR 2000 DEVELOPER, "Foobar 2000 release and feature notes", WWW.HYDROGENAUDIO.ORG, (20031223), URL: http://www.hydrogenaudio.org/forums/index.php?showtopic=5064, (20060111), XP002362150 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - JETAUDIO, "jet audio total solutions for multimedia URL - http://www.jetaudio.com/products/jetaudio/features_v46.html DWWW- 2003-03-31", WWW.JETAUDIO.COM, (20030331), XP002236662 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AP] - THOMAS MCGUIRE, "A complete guide to Foobar 2000", WWW.TECHSPOT.COM, (20050515), URL: http://www.techspot.com/tweaks/foobar/, (20060111), XP002362149 [AP] * the whole document * | [A] - NILSSON M, "ID3 tag: ID3v2.4.0: Main Structure and Native Frames", WWW.ID3.ORG, (20001101), XP002302388 [A] 1-15 * page 27, paragraph 4.11 - page 28, paragraph 4.12 * | [ ] - DAVID ROBINSON, "Replay Gain - a proposed standard", WWW.REPLAYGAIN.ORG, (20011010), URL: www.replaygain.org, (20060110), XP002362151 [ ] * the whole document * |