EP1647411 - Method of printing thermal media by aligning image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyoung-il 106-1308 Woncheon Jugong Apt. Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Kyung-pyo 210-1006 Hyundai Apt. Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05106367.5 | 12.07.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | KR20040054701 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004054701 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1647411 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1647411 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647411 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J2/335, G03C1/52 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B41J2/335 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/42 (EP,KR,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,KR,US);
B41J3/60 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | B41J3/60, B41J2/325, B41J2/335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bedrucken von thermischem Medium mittels Bildausrichtung | [2006/16] | English: | Method of printing thermal media by aligning image | [2006/16] | French: | Procédé d'imprimer média thermique par alignement de l'image | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 08.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.08.2009 | [2010/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5101222 (HAKKAKU KUNIO [JP]) [Y] 9 * column 7, line 4 - line 45 * * column 8, line 59 - column 11, line 20 *; | [A]US5488458 (BENEDICT LAWRENCE R [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6201255 (TORCHALSKI KARL [US], et al) [A] 8,10-13 * abstract *; | [Y]US2001022609 (SUZUKI ETSURO [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0076] *; | [Y]US2002001027 (SUGIOKA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] *; | [PX]US2005140770 (KANG KYUNG-PYO [KR], et al) [PX] 1,9* abstract * |