EP1621891 - Device for measuring accelerations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arend, Peter Fritz Roessler Strasse 3 79718, Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Ziegler, Alfred Limmatauweg 5 5408, Ennetbaden / CH | [2006/05] | Application number, filing date | 05106485.5 | 14.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | CH20040001269 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: CH 12692004 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621891 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08, G01P3/49, G01P15/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G01P15/003 (EP);
G01P15/005 (EP);
G01P3/49 (EP);
G01P3/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung von Beschleunigungen | [2006/05] | English: | Device for measuring accelerations | [2006/05] | French: | Dispositif pour la mesure d'accélérations | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3555326 (TALEBI ALBOOTALEB, et al) [A] 1,2,4,14-16 * column 2, line 51 - line 61; figure 2 *; | [X]US3775684 (HOODWIN L) [X] 1-5,7,13-16 * column 1, line 42 - line 65 * * column 2, line 22 - line 52; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE10149794 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0053]; figures 1,2 *; | [X] - REIS R. J. ; STELTER T. E., "Continuous displacement rotary accelerometer", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197006), vol. 13, no. 1, page 288, XP002298743 [X] 1,15 * the whole document * | [A] - TERESA RESTIVO M, "A case study of induced eddy currents", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199511), vol. 51, no. 2-3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 203 - 210, XP004303591 [A] 1,15 * page 208, column R, paragraph L - page 209, column R, paragraph 1; figures 10,11,13,14 * | Examination | WO02093179 |