EP1661486 - Improvements in the design of toothbrushes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dooley, Dr. Peter 19 Beechy Lees Road Otford near Sevenoaks 10th TN14 5QJ / GB | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Tolfree, Roger, et al Tolfree Patents and Trademarks Toll Drove Manea Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Tolfree, Roger, et al Tolfree Patents and Trademarks, Toll Drove Manea, Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05106549.8 | 15.07.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | GB20040023423 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423423 | EP20050102888 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102888 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661486 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1661486 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00, A46B9/06 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A46B5/0016 (EP);
A46B5/00 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP);
A46B9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/18] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserungen am Entwurf von Zahnbürsten | [2006/22] | English: | Improvements in the design of toothbrushes | [2006/22] | French: | Améliorations dans la conception de brosses à dents | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.04.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US2084873 (STRAUSE LOUIS J) [XD] 1,3-8 * the whole document * [Y] 11; | [A]US4457039 (MASSARI BERARDO [IT]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US4672706 (HILL PERCY H [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0471312 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [XDY]US5315730 (KIM IL PYUNG [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-7 * the whole document * [Y] 11; | [Y]US5535474 (SALAZAR ALFRED [US]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5604951 (SHIPP ANTHONY D [US]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1132326 | US2084873 | US2668308 | US3934298 | US4150457 | US4796325 | US5315730 |