EP1586932 - Night vision system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bierleutgeb, Gerhard Friedrich-Groos-Straße 13 59597, Erwitte / DE | [2005/42] | Application number, filing date | 05106599.3 | 20.12.2003 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586932 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586932 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/12 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G02B27/01 (EP);
G02B23/12 (EP);
H04N23/11 (EP);
H04N23/21 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/26] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nachtsichtsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2005/42] | English: | Night vision system for vehicles | [2005/42] | French: | Système actif de vision nocturne pour véhicule automobile | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03029516.6 / EP1437615 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2008
15.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Stückrad, Björn Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management HPC U800 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/04] | 07.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.12.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2006 | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.09.2008 | GB | 20.12.2008 | IT | 20.12.2011 | [2012/50] |
Former [2010/01] | ES | 08.09.2008 | |
GB | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2661268 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]US5555324 (WAXMAN ALLEN M [US], et al); | [A]WO0137000 (SYNEXUS CORP [US]); | by applicant | DE69506174T |