EP1752220 - Sample tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Automation Partnership (Cambridge) Limited York Way Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5WY / GB | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woods, Peter William 13 Princess Drive Sawston, Cambridgeshire CB2 4DL / GB | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05106904.5 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752220 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L3/14 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B01L3/50855 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2300/021 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0851 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L9/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/42] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reagenzglas | [2007/07] | English: | Sample tube | [2007/07] | French: | Eprouvette | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9204978 (CRYO CELL INT [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 4,6,15,16,24 * * page 19, paragraph 5 - page 21, paragraph 4 * * page 24, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 7 ** page 27, paragraph 4 - page 27, paragraph 5 *; | [XY]US5916526 (ROBBINS PAUL B [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 20 - column 5, line 30 * [Y] 1-6; | [A]DE20004409U (WEIS LUDWIG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 5a,5b,6d * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 22 *; | [A]US6203503 (KELLY KARIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 33 - column 2, line 41 *; | [Y]EP1477226 (AUTOM PARTNERSHIP CAMBRIDGE [GB]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * |