EP1612172 - Device for conveying empty rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohmann, Lothar Albrecht-Dürer-Str. 19 97250 Erlabrunn / DE | 02 /
Röder, Klaus Friesstr. 8 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2006/01] | Application number, filing date | 05107281.7 | 27.11.2002 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | DE2001159520 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10159520 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612172 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612172 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B65H19/12 (EP,US);
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41858 (EP,US);
B65H2405/422 (EP,US);
B65H2405/4221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport von Restrollen | [2006/01] | English: | Device for conveying empty rolls | [2006/01] | French: | Dispositif pour transporter des rouleaux vides | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02787402.3 / EP1451086 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | IE | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | LU | 27.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | NL | 07.03.2007 | |
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | NL | 07.03.2007 | |
ES | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01081959 ; | [A]DE2527778 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W) [A] * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]NL8802239 (ALUMINIUM EN ROESTVASTSTAAL CT) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A]DE4344743 (FALKENSTEIN LAGER FOERDERTECH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5762283 (BUCHMEYER THEODOOR ANTONIUS [NL], et al) [A] * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 17; figure 5 *; | [A]DE19860475 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 61 - line 63; figure - *; | [A]WO0068115 (WESTFALIA WST SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE], et al) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890714), vol. 013, no. 309, Database accession no. (P - 898), & JP01081959 A 19890328 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |