EP1626282 - Microgyroscope with frequency detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Philippe 43, allée des Romantiques 38100, GRENOBLE / FR | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/07] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05107425.0 | 12.08.2005 | [2006/07] | Priority number, date | FR20040051849 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: FR 0451849 | [2006/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626282 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1626282 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01P9/04, G01P3/14, G01C19/56 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
G01C19/574 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/42] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrokreisel mit Frequenzdetektion | [2006/07] | English: | Microgyroscope with frequency detection | [2006/07] | French: | Micro gyromètre a détection frequentielle | [2006/07] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 17.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0507338 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US6032531 (ROSZHART TERRY V [US]) [Y] 1-12,15,16 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 46 * * column 8, line 49 - line 61 * * column 13, line 28 - line 43 * * column 19, line 20 - line 45 * * claims 1,5 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2004154400 (JOHNSON BURGESS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,15,16 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 30 * * figure 1 * |