EP1655843 - Decoder and method for decoding low-density parity-check (LDPC) code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Kabushi Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Kenji Toshiba Corporation IP Division 1-1, Shibarua 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107528.1 | 16.08.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | JP20040324382 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004324382 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655843 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655843 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1655843 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
H03M13/1111 (EP,US);
H03M13/11 (KR);
H03M13/19 (KR);
H03M13/3738 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Decodierer und Decodierungsmethode für Low-Density Parity Check (LDPC) Codes | [2006/51] | English: | Decoder and method for decoding low-density parity-check (LDPC) code | [2006/19] | French: | Décodeur et méthode de décodage pour des codes LDPC | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/19] | Dekodierer und Decodierungsmethode für Low-Density Parity Check (LDPC) Codes | Examination procedure | 17.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.05.2007 | [2010/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004140915 (SHEN BA-ZHONG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058]; figure 6 *; | [A] - FOSSORIER M P C, "Iterative reliability-based decoding of low-density parity check codes", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200105), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 908 - 917, XP001101010 [A] 1-10 * page 910 - page 911 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.924874 | [A] - AHMED A ET AL, "Performance analysis of the adaptive parity check matrix based soft-decision decoding algorithm", PROC., IEEE ASIMOLAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA, (20041107), ISBN 0-7803-8622-1, pages 1995 - 1999, XP010781178 [A] 1-10 * page 1998, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2004.1399514 | [A] - REID A C ET AL, "Convergence and errors in turbo-decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (200112), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 2045 - 2051, XP002313756 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.974246 |