EP1619668 - Detection of abnormal recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chang-hyeon 220-904 Woncheon Jukong Apt. 548 Woncheon-dong Padal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05108883.9 | 31.10.2001 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | US20010789822 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: US 789822 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1619668 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1619668 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/53, G11B21/18, G11B27/36 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G11B5/534 (EP,US);
G11B15/46 (KR);
G11B15/087 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B5/0086 (EP,US);
G11B5/53 (EP,US);
G11B15/04 (EP,US);
G11B15/125 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/04] | Title | German: | Detektion einer abnormalen Aufzeichnung | [2006/04] | English: | Detection of abnormal recording | [2006/04] | French: | Détection d'un enregistrement erroné | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01309243.2 / EP1237151 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH01296408 ; | [XA]JPS6120284 ; | [X]JPH08221701 ; | [A]JPS636982 (SONY CORP) [A] 11 * abstract *; | [XAY]JPH01296408 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-10,13-17,26,29 * the whole document * * figure 7 * * figure 8 * [A] 23-25,11 [Y] 12,18-22,27,28; | [Y]EP0364961 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 19-22,28 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 18 *; | [Y]JPH02287904 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 19,22,27,28,30* abstract *; | [Y]JPH0581784 (CANON KK) [Y] 19-22,28,30 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10143812 (SHARP KK) [A] 11 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0845775 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [Y] 12,18,20,21 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 2 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900216), vol. 014, no. 084, Database accession no. (P - 1007), & JP01296408 A 19891129 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-22,26-29 * abstract * [A] 3,11,23-25 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860614), vol. 010, no. 169, Database accession no. (P - 468), & JP61020284 A 19860129 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08221701 A 19960830 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4849979 | JPH01296408 | US5291342 | US6134384 | US6141486 | US6141164 | US6163421 |