EP1642491 - Feeder device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallignani S.p.A. Via Alcide De Gasperi 34 48026 Russi (RA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Gallignani S.p.A. Via A. De Gasperi 34 48026 Russi RA / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravaglia, Paolo Via Reale, 165 48012, Bagnacavallo RA / IT | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario, et al C/o Tonucci & Partners Via Trieste 31/A 35121 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Leone, Mario, et al c/o Tonucci & Partners Via Trieste 31/A 35121 Padova / IT | ||
Former [2006/14] | Leone, Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 05108948.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | IT2004RM00466 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: IT RM20040466 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642491 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642491 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/10 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A01F15/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zuführeinrichtung | [2006/14] | English: | Feeder device | [2006/14] | French: | Dispositif d'introduction | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 06.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB688154 (AUGUST CLAAS, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 90 - page 3, line 2; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4579052 (SCHAIBLE SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-3,14 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0381068 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-3,14 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 25; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]EP0508186 (FORTSCHRITT ERNTEMASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,14 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 47; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5394682 (FRIMML ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-3 * |