EP1652719 - Power-assisted differential assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. One Dauch Drive Detroit, MI 48211-1198 / US | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duncan, Bruce A. 43910 Cadburry Drive Clinton Township, MI 48038 / US | [2017/47] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
Duncan, Bruce A. 43910 Cadburry Drive Clinton Township, Michigan 48038 / US | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Somlo, Tommy, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Ekström, Nils, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Vink, Charlotta, et al AWAPATENT AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Kraenzmer, Martin, et al Awapatent AB, Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05109581.8 | 14.10.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | US20040978870 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: US 978870 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652719 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652719 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/36, B60K6/405, B60K6/48, B60K17/02, B60K1/00, B60K17/16 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
B60K1/00 (EP,US);
B60K17/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60K17/02 (EP,US);
B60K6/36 (EP,US);
B60K6/405 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | B60K23/04, B60K6/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/47] |
Former [2007/02] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fremdkraftunterstützte Ausgleichsgetriebeanordnung | [2017/27] | English: | Power-assisted differential assembly | [2006/18] | French: | Assemblage de différentiel assisté | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/18] | Fremdkraftunterstützte Ausgleichsgetriebeanordnung | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 04.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | [2018/41] |
Former [2018/23] | ES | 22.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5117931 (NISHIDA MINORU [JP]) [A] 1,11,18 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9606749 (EMME QUATTRO SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1,11,18 * figures 1-28 *; | [XA]US5513719 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 38; figures 1-6 * [A] 14; | [A]US5788006 (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP]) [A] 1,11,18 * figures 1-9 *; | [X]GB2335404 (PROUDLER TREVOR LEE [GB]) [X] 11-13,15,17 * page 6, line 27 - page 13, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1038722 (B & C SPEAKERS S P A [IT]) [A] 1,11,18 * figures 1-13 *; | [X]US2001016532 (JUNG HU-YONG [KR]) [X] 11-13,15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0033]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002065163 (DEICHL TILO [DE], et al) [A] 1,11,18 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]USRE37743E (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [X] 18-20,24 * column 3, line 33 - column 10, line 46; figures 1-8; claim 2 *; | [A]US6715291 (LIAO GORDON [TW]) [A] 1,11,18* figures 1-19 * |